CA SB157 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 233, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 233, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1708.85 of the Civil Code, and to amend Section 6276.12 of the Government Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Invasion of privacy: distribution of sexually explicit materials: protection of plaintiff’s identity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 157 Wieckowski Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB157 Wieckowski (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB157 Wieckowski (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 233, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 68.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1257.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Published May 17 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 626.) (April 4). |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1708.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6276.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |