CA SB157 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11379.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substance offenses: methamphetamine or
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-04-14 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation. | |
2009-04-01 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2009-02-23 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-02-13 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | |
2009-02-12 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_157&sess=0910&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_157_bill_20090212_introduced.html |