CA SB1530 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 1032 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veterans homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - Assembly - SB 1530 Military and Veterans Affairs Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1530 M.&V.A. (Archuleta) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1530 M.&V.A. (Archuleta) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-07-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-07-02 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2024-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6038.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3875.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3704.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 21. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 1032 | New Code | See Bill Text |