CA SB1511 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Jackson.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Jackson.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1010.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Sections 400, 3901, 5614, and 7643 of, and to repeal and add Section 17311.7 of, the Family Code, relating to family law, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Family law omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Jackson. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5471.) (August 16). |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Set for hearing August 16. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | July 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Set for hearing July 2. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4641.) (June 12). |
2018-06-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing June 12. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after May 11. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1010.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 17311.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 3111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 3901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 5614 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 7643 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 69619.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 70677 | Amended Code | Citation Text |