CA SB1507 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 7094, 9272, 30459.2, 32472, 40212, 41172, 43523, 45868, 46623, 50156.12, 55333, and 60632 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxpayers’ Rights Advocate: release or return of levy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1507 GOV. & F. (McGuire) Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - SB 1507 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1507 GOV. & F (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-09SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-06SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5164.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-06-25SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-06-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5978.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2018-06-11AssemblyJune 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-05-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-05-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-10SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5011.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4915.) (May 2).
2018-04-17SenateSet for hearing May 2.
2018-04-04SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-03-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 21.
2018-03-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback