CA SB1506 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3365, 3691, 3691.1, 3701, and 3704.7 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property taxation: tax collector: notices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 1506 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1506 GOV. & F (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-16 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-07-05SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6109.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-05-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-10SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5015.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-07SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4812.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-04SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-03-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 21.
2018-03-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback