CA SB1501 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 20282 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 182, 210, 212, 215, 223, 252, 254, 255, 257, 258, 259, 262, 263, 266, 267, 268, 269, 280, 289, 296, 321, 322, 324, 325, 326, 327, 342, 363, 364, 368, 372, 375, 395.04, 414, 422, 450.1, 455, 458.1, 463, 465, 551, 552, 562, and 648 of, and to amend the heading of Article 3 (commencing with Section 250) of Chapter 3 of Part 1 of Division 2 of, the Military and Veterans Code, and to amend Section 32177.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to military.
Title
Military and veterans: enlisted persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 1501 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1501 V.A. (Newman) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1501 V.A. (Newman) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6109.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4880.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4791.) (April 24). |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 6. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |