CA SB1499 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 198, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 198, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 603, 622, 624, 626, 627, 651, 653, 654, and 655 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 601) of Part 1 of Division 1 of, to amend and renumber Section 602 of, and to repeal Sections 601, 625, 628, 652, and 656 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to food and agriculture.
Title
Department of Food and Agriculture: Department of Agriculture Building Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1499 AGRI. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1499 AGRI (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1499 AGRI (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 198, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5830.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3673.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3539.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 601 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 603 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 622 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 624 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 625 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 626 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 627 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 628 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 651 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 652 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 653 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 654 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 655 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 656 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |