CA SB1498 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 452, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 452, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7500.3, 7502.1, 7502.2, 7522, 7574.14, 7582.2, 7742, 10131.3, 10232.4, 10239, 11000.1, 11010.8, 11010.85, 11243, 17511.1, 17537.2, and 20009 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 1632.5, 1748.13, 1788.100, 1788.103, 1788.104, 1789.12, 1798.3, 1812.201, 1916.5, 2923.3, 2924, 2924.8, 2924.12, 2924.17, 2924.19, 2924.20, 2924c, and 2953 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 336a, 580d, 580e, 684.115, 995.710, and 1571 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 163, 201, 500, 1001, 1101.1, 1300, 2207, 2510, 2601, 3100, 5122, 7122, 7813.5, 8011.5, 9122, 12302, 12504, 12532, 13205, 13406, 13408.5, 14004, 15911.21, 17711.02, 17713.12, 23000, 25004, 25005, 25014.6, 25102, 25206.1, 25243.5, 25247, 25254, 25302, 25604, 25606, 25607, 25612.5, 25614, 25620, 25702, 28033, 28505, 28715, 29200, 29503, 31004, 31158, 31408, 31503, and 31513 of the Corporations Code, to amend Section 94158 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 125, 355, 1481, 2003, 2105, 2123, 4057, 4805.055, 4970, 5104, 5106, 12003, 12104, 12201, 14003, 14200.1, 14200.2, 14381, 17002, 17201, 17210.2, 17214, 17303, 17311, 17320, 17331, 17423.1, 18002, 18002.5, 18339, 18427.9, 18596, 22005, 22101, 22105.1, 22159.5, 22160, 22365, 22373, 22380.5, 22603, 22756, 22800, 23001, 23005, 23070, 23071, 23072, 23073, 23074, 23102, 28104, 28110, 30002, 30005, 30217, 31055, 50003, 50140, 50303, 50307.1, 50316.5, 100002, 100006, and 100025 of, and to amend the headings of Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 300) of Division 1, Article 2 (commencing with Section 320) of Chapter 3 of Division 1, Article 1 (commencing with Section 28106) of Chapter 2 of Division 12.5, and Article 1 (commencing with Section 100003) of Chapter 2 of Division 25 of, the Financial Code, to amend Sections 1322, 5970, 6253.4, 6254.5, 6254.12, 6276.18, 7465, 7474, 7480, 7603, 7921.505, 7922.635, 7929.005, 7930.145, 12657, 12659, 12804, 12896, 13984, 53344.1, 53638, 53661, 57603, 57606, 57607, and 75030.5 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 771, 828, 845, 845.5, 1280.7, 12414.31, 14053, and 15036 of the Insurance Code, to amend Section 4600.5 of the Labor Code, to amend Sections 186.9, 830.3, 830.11, and 32000 of the Penal Code, to amend Sections 10200 and 11604.5 of the Probate Code, to amend Section 4734 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 15630.2 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to financial institutions.
Title
Financial institutions: Department of Financial Protection and Innovation: money transmissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB1498 B. & F.I (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1498 B. & F.I. Senate Third Reading By GRAYSON (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1498 B. & F.I (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1498 B. & F.I. Senate Third Reading By GRAYSON (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1498 B. & F.I (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 452, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5344.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Grayson. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3648.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3457.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |