CA SB1498 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 12463.1, 17551, 25502.5, 27202, 27230, 27263, 27287, 27293, 27294, 27320, 27321, 27322.3, 27323, 27327, 27329, 27397, 34090, 34093, 34852, 34855, 34857, 36522, 36802, 37107, 37547, 37607, 37683, 38400, 38406, 38741, 38780, 38782, 39501, 39560, 39564, 39573, 39574, 39901, 40537, 40538, 40539, 40603, 40604, 40804, 40806, 40812, 40813, 40814, 41204, 41205, 41602, 41603, 41605, 41608, 41609, 41610, 41611, 41803.7, 43625, 43626, 53343.2, 53398.60, 53398.61, 53398.75, and 54930 of the Government Code, to amend Section 469 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to repeal Section 36626 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government Omnibus Act of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-05-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-05-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-10SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5015.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-07SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4811.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-04-12SenateApril 18 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-03-15SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-03-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1.
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12463.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code17551Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code25502.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27202Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27230Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27263Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27287Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27293Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27294Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27320Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27321Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27322.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27323Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27327Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27329Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27397Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code34090Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code34093Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code34852Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code34855Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code34857Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code36522Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code36802Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code37107Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code37547Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code37607Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code37683Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code38400Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code38406Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code38741Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code38780Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code38782Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code39501Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code39560Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code39564Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code39573Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code39574Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code39901Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code40537Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code40538Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code40539Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code40603Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code40604Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code40804Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code40806Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code40812Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code40813Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code40814Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code41204Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code41205Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code41602Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code41603Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code41605Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code41608Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code41609Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code41610Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code41611Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code41803.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code43625Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code43626Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53343.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53398.60Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53398.61Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53398.75Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code54930Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code469Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code36626Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback