CA SB1496 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 474, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 474, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 830.11 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 6295, 6592, 6593, 6593.5, 6703, 6901, 6981, 7093.6, 7097, 7657, 7658, 8126, 8191, 8877, 8878, 8957, 9151, 9196, 9275, 9278, 12221, 30282, 30283, 30315, 30361, 30421, 30459.15, 30459.5, 32471.5, 34013, 34016, 34018, 38452, 38453, 38503, 38601, 38631, 40102, 40103, 40111, 40121, 40155, 40215, 41095, 41096, 41097, 41100, 41107, 41123.5, 41171.5, 41175, 43157, 43158, 43444.2, 43451, 43491, 43526, 45155, 45156, 45605, 45651, 45801, 45871, 46156, 46157, 46406, 46501, 46551, 46626, 46628, 50112.2, 50112.3, 50136, 50139, 50151, 50156.15, 50156.18, 55044, 55046.5, 55161, 55162, 55205, 55221, 55281, 55332.5, 55336, 60209, 60211, 60407, 60521, 60581, 60633.2, and 60637 of, to add Sections 6459.5, 7656.5, 8754.5, 30185.5, 34013.1, 38405.5, 40065.5, 41054.5, 43154.5, 45152.5, 46153.5, 50111.5, 55041.5, and 60208.5 to, and to repeal Section 19559 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Taxation: tax, fee, and surcharge administration: insurance tax rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1496 GOV. & F. (Caballero) Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1496 GOV.& F. Senate Third Reading By QUIRK (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1496 GOV. & F (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1496 GOV.& F. Senate Third Reading By QUIRK (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1496 GOV. & F (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 474, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5377.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2022-08-10 | Assembly | August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3648.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3461.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |