CA SB1493 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 197, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 197, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1103 and 1107 of the Evidence Code, to amend Section 1816 of the Family Code, to amend Sections 1031, 7286, 12525.5, 15401, and 15425 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1233.5 and 1259.5 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 475 of the Military and Veterans Code, to amend Sections 243, 273.5, 273.6, 273.65, 602, 1043, 1127e, 1192.5, 1203.055, 1203.097, 1203.4b, 1203.9, 1270.1, 1346.1, 1370, 1387, 11105, 11163.3, 13151, 13511.1, 13519, 13777, 13823.16, and 14143 of the Penal Code, to amend Section 5164 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 782 and 15610.63 of, and to add Section 700.3 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public safety.
Title
Public safety omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1493 PUB. S. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1493 PUB. S (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1493 PUB. S (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 197, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5830.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3673.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3520.) (April 26). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |