CA SB1493 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 20092 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 3206, 5018.1, 5080.05, 5080.23, 6107, 6201, 6216.1, 6477, 6914, 7730, 8618, 8622, 30512, 30513, 33503, 71204, 71204.9, 71205.3, 71210, 71211, 71212, 71213, 71215, and 71216 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 71203) of Division 36 of, to add and repeal Section 3114 of, and to repeal Section 5019.15 of, the Public Resources Code, and to repeal Chapter 1520 of the Statutes of 1967, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1493 N.R. & W (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-05-30AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-05-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-05-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and W.,P., & W.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4942.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4699.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2018-02-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code20092Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code30512Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code30513Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code3113Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code3114Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code3206Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code33503Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5018.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5019.15Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5080.05Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5080.23Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code6107Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code6201Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code6216.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code6477Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code6914Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code71204Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code71204.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code71205.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code71210Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code71211Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code71212Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code71213Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code71215Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code71216Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code7730Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code8618Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code8622Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback