CA SB1492 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 422, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 422, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5095, 5130, and 7341 of, and to add Section 5100.1 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 94874, 94880, 94927.5, and 94947 of the Education Code, relating to the Department of Consumer Affairs.
Title
The Department of Consumer Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1492 B.P.&E.D. (Hill) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1492 B., P. & E.D. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1492 B.P.&E.D (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1492 B., P. & E.D. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1492 B.P.&E.D (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 422, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5463.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6313.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HIGHER ED. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5090.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4784.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 5095 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5100.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5116.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7341 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7530 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94874 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94880 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94927.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94947 | Amended Code | Citation Text |