CA SB1491 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 27, 865, 1607, 1611, 1611.3, 1611.5, 1612, 1614, 1615, 1621, 1645, 1680, 1750, 1750.2, 1750.4, 1751, 1753.7, 2290.5, 2556, 3004, 3040, 3146, 3735, 3751, 4848, 4980.37, 4980.39, 4980.41, 4980.72, 4980.78, 4980.79, 4990.30, 4992, 4996.17, 4999.14, 4999.22, 4999.32, 4999.48, 4999.60, 4999.62, 4999.63, and 4999.100 of, and to repeal Sections 650.4, 1601.5, and 1601.6 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 6924 of the Family Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healing arts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1491 B.P.&E.D (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom consent calendar.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-04AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-17SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5090.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4784.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2018-02-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code1601.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1601.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1607Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1611Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1611.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1611.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1612Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1614Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1615Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1621Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1645Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1680Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1750Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1750.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1750.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1751Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1753.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2290.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2556Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code27Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3004Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3040Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3146Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3735Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3751Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4848Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.37Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.39Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.41Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.72Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.78Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.79Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4990.30Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4992Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4996.17Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.100Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.14Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.22Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.32Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.48Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.60Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.62Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.63Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code650.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code865Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code6924Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback