CA SB1490 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - April 24 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - April 24 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7.1, 1689.5, 1689.24, 1695.1, and 1812.303 of the Civil Code, and to amend Section 6700 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Holidays: Columbus Day: Indigenous Peoples’ Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | April 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1689.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1689.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1695.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1812.303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 7.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB1490 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB1490 |