CA SB1489 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - April 24 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 80147.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to water, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Drought, Water, Parks, Climate, Coastal Protection, and Outdoor Access For All Act of 2018: water recycling.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19SenateApril 24 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-12SenateRe-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code3214Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code80147.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback