CA SB1488 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 28840, 28841, and 28844 of, to add Sections 28841.2, 28841.4, and 28841.6 to, and to repeal Section 28845 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District: Office of the BART Inspector General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1488 Glazer Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1488 Glazer Concurrence Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1488 Glazer Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1488 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Mayes (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1488 Glazer (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1488 Glazer Concurrence Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1488 Glazer Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1488 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Mayes (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1488 Glazer (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5073.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5072.) |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Durazo. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5072.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2022-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 2. Page 6003.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2022-07-29 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3863.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3515.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 3442.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 28840 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 28841 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 28841.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 28841.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 28841.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 28844 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 28845 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |