CA SB1487 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2351 to the Fish and Game Code, relating to African species.
Title
Iconic African Species Protection Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1487 Stern Senate Third Reading By KALRA (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1487 Stern Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1487 Stern (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1487 Stern Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1487 Stern (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 6189.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 28). |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and JUD. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4419.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4312.) (May 25). |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | May 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | May 7 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4820.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2351 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 740.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |