CA SB1483 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-08 - August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 16 @ 9:00 am Assembly Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 9810, 9812.5, 9830.5, 9832.5, 9842, 9844, 9847.5, 9849, 9851, 9853, 9855.3, 9855.9, 9860, 9862.5, 9863, 19032, 19162, and 19163 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 9855 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Consumer Affairs: electronic and appliance repair, home furnishings, and thermal insulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1483 Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4358.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4312.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4784.) (April 23).
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19032Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19162Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19163Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9810Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9812.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9830.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9832.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9842Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9844Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9847.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9849Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9851Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9853Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9855Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9855.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9855.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9860Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9862.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9863Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback