CA SB1482 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 101, 800, 1601.3, 1680, 1901, 1902, 1902.1, 1902.2, 1902.3, 1903, 1904, 1905, 1905.1, 1905.2, 1906, 1909, 1910.5, 1916, 1917, 1917.1, 1917.3, 1918, 1922, 1926.1, 1926.2, 1926.3, 1926.4, 1930, 1931, 1932, 1934, 1935, 1936, 1936.1, 1940, 1941, 1942, 1943, 1944, 1947, 1949, 1950, 1950.5, 1951, 1952, 1955, 1957, 1958, 1958.1, 1962, 1963, 1964, 1966, 1966.1, 1966.2, 1966.4, 1966.5, 1966.6, and 1967 of, and to add Section 1941.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 13401 of the Corporations Code, and to amend Section 44876 of the Education Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dental hygienists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1482 Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom consent calendar.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-07-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4358.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4312.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4784.) (April 23).
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code101Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1601.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1680Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1901Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1901.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code1902Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1902.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1902.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1902.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1903Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1904Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1905Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1905.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1905.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1906Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1909Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1910.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1916Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1917Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1917.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1917.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1918Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1922Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1926.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1926.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1926.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1926.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1930Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1931Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1932Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1934Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1935Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1936Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1936.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1940Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1941Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1941.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code1942Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1943Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1944Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1947Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1949Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1950Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1950.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1951Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1952Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1955Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1957Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1958Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1958.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1962Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1963Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1964Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1966Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1966.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1966.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1966.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1966.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1966.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1967Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code800Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code13401Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code44876Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback