CA SB1481 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8517, 8519, 8519.5, 8520, 8528, 8550, 8553, 8613, 8619, 8623, 8663, 8674, and 8698.3 of, and to add Sections 8504.2, 8504.3, 8504.4, and 8623.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to structural pest control.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Structural pest control: certification: fumigation: penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1481 Hill et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1481 Hill Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1481 Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and E.S. & T.M.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4357.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4311.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4784.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code8504.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code8504.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code8504.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code8517Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8519Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8519.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8520Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8528Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8550Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8553Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8613Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8619Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8623Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8623.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code8663Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8674Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8698.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback