CA SB1480 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 571, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 101.7, 328, 2064.5, 2065, 2135, 2428, 2499.5, 2529.1, 2529.5, 2529.6, 2708, 2816, 2892.6, 2895, 3047, 3147, 3680, 4518, 4548, 4604, 4809.7, 4830, 4836.2, and 11506 of, and to add Sections 1006.5, 2892.7, 4518.1, 4826.4, 4829.5, and 4841.2 to, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 7000, 7103, 8731, 8778.5, 8785, 103775, and 103780 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend an initiative act entitled “An act prescribing the terms upon which licenses may be issued to practitioners of chiropractic, creating the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners, and declaring its powers and duties, prescribing penalties for violation hereof, and repealing all acts and parts of acts inconsistent herewith” approved by voters on November 7, 1922, (the Chiropractic Act) by amending Sections 5 and 12 of the act, relating to professions and vocations, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and vocations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1480 Hill et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1480 Hill Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1480 Hill (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-19 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 571, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-19 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 6135.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 6977.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-15AssemblyAugust 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 19).
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 4357.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4311.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4784.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code1006.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code1007New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code101Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code101.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code109.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code11506Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2064.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2065Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2135Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2428Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2499.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2529.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2529.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2529.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2708Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2715Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2788Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2816Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2892.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2892.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code2895Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3047Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3147Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code328Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3680Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4008Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4518Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4518.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4548Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4604Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4809.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4826.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4829.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4830Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4836.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4841.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4990.06Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5011Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code103775Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code103780Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code7000Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code7103Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code8731Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code8778.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code8785Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback