CA SB1480 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 254.5, 1840, and 4674 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Property taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Edward Hernandez [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] |
Sen. John Moorlach [R] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1480 Committee On GOV. & F. (Hertzberg) Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - SB 1480 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1480 Committee On GOV. & F. (Hertzberg) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - SB 1480 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1480 Committee On GOV. & F. (Hertzberg) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4548.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5488.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | June 6 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3712.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3610.) (April 20). |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 17. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 1840 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 254.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 4674 | Amended Code | Citation Text |