CA SB1479 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - April 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Hearing: Apr 25 @ 1:30 pm in Room 3191
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 8400) to Division 4.1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority: billing requirement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateApril 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code130051.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8400New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback