CA SB1478 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14838.5 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 999.5 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to disabled veteran business enterprises.
Title
Disabled veteran business enterprises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1478 Archuleta (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J.,E.D., & E. and M. & V.A. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3917.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3798.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3516.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 3324.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and M. & V.A. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14838.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 999.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |