CA SB1477 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 378, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 910.4 of, to add Section 748.6 to, and to add Article 12 (commencing with Section 921) and Article 13 (commencing with Section 922) to Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 1 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Low-emissions buildings and sources of heat energy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1477 Stern et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1477 Stern Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1477 Stern (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 378, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-13 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 6054.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 6805.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 27).
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-06-18AssemblyJune 18 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-18AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & E.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4418.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4311.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-23SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4721.) (April 18).
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 4515.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and EQ.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code25970New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code748.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code910.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback