CA SB1474 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Hearing: Jul 16 @ 1:00 pm in State Capitol, Assembly Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 27, 101, 125.9, 130, 144, 200.1, 205, 494.5, 1913, 1917, 1917.1, 1922, 2065, 2113, 2135.5, 2460, 2841, 2847.1, 2847.3, 2920, 2933, 3504, 3512, 4001, 4003, 4501, 4503, 4604, 4621, 4800, 4804.5, 4990, 4990.04, 5600.4, 7000, 7000.5, 7000.6, 7011.4, 7011.5, 7011.8, 7015, 7017.3, 7028.7, 7030, 7031, 7058.7, 7071.4, 7080.5, 7085.5, 7099.2, 7123.5, 7135, 7136, 7137, 7137.5, 7138, 7139.1, 7139.2, 7145.5, 7159, 7170, 7303, 8516, 10050, 11301, 16100, and 19164 of, and to add Sections 5650.5 and 7099.9 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 94950 of the Education Code, relating to business and professions, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business and professions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB1474 B.P.&E.D (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2020-06-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-23SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-06-02SenateHearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure.
2020-05-26SenateSet for hearing June 1.
2020-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3550.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-14SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2020-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2020-05-11SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2020-03-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 16.
2020-03-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code10050Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code101Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code11301Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code125.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code130Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code144Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code16100Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1913Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19164Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1917Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1917.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1922Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code200.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code205Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2065Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2113Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2135.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2460Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code27Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2841Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2847.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2847.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2920Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2933Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3504Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3512Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4001Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4003Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4501Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4503Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4604Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4621Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4800Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4804.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code494.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4990Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4990.04Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5600.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5650.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7000Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7000.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7000.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7011.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7011.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7011.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7015Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7017.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7028.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7030Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7031Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7058.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7071.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7080.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7085.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7099.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7099.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7123.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7135Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7136Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7137Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7137.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7138Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7139.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7139.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7145.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7159Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7170Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7303Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8516Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code94950Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback