CA SB1474 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1044 and 5415.5 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Passenger stage corporations: charter-party carriers of passengers: impoundment of vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1474 Hill Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1474 Hill Senate Third Reading By LACKEY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1474 Hill (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on C. & C. and PUB. S.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 4356.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4311.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4851.) (April 25).
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4820.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 25 in E., U. & C. pending receipt.
2018-04-19SenateRe-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and E., U. & C.
2018-04-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-11SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code7150.50Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code1044New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code5415.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback