CA SB1470 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 7.1 (commencing with Section 160) to Division 1 of the Labor Code, relating to employment development.
Title
Commission on the Future of Work.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1470 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1470 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4457.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4311.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4817.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | April 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 160 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 9902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |