CA SB147 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 798.34 and 799.9 of the Civil Code, relating to mobilehome parks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobilehome parks: residency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB147 Dodd (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 12).
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 6. Page 1143.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-09SenatePublished May 9 at 9 p.m.
2017-05-09SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 945.) (May 2).
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing May 2.
2017-01-26SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-01-18SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17.
2017-01-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code798.34Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code799.9Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback