CA SB1469 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65852.2 and 65852.22 of the Government Code, and to add Section 17921.2 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to land use.
Title
Land use: accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4811.) (April 25). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4823.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | April 17 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65852.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65852.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 17921.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 13399.41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |