CA SB1466 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7205 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Local sales taxes: online sales: place of delivery.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. John Moorlach [R] |
Sen. John Moorlach [R] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB1466 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB1466 |