CA SB1465 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 802, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 802, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: 2024 Olympic Games and Paralympic
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1465 De Le (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1465 De Leon Senate Third Reading By RENDON (Y: 71 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1465 De Le (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1465 De Leon Senate Third Reading By RENDON (Y: 71 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1465 De Le (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 802, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 5577.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 6. Page 6473.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 4110.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4011.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 3494.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |