CA SB1464 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - April 26 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - April 26 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 16644) to Part 2 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 101029 and 120155 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Law enforcement: public health orders.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | April 26 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | April 20 set for final hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26 in PUB. S. pending receipt. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | April 6 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | March 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16644 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 101029 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |