CA SB1459 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 26050.2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: provisional license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1459 Cannella Third Reading Urgency By WOOD (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1459 Cannella et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1459 Cannella et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 3.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateUrgency clause adopted.
2018-08-31SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.)
2018-08-31SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-08-31SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 1.) (August 29).
2018-08-28AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-08-27AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-24AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 8).
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4941.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-24SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-23SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4696.) (April 17).
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-04-12SenateRe-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback