CA SB1457 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on the inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on the inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 46014 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: excused absences: religious or moral instruction.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Morrell [R] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] |
Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1457 Morrell Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1457 Morrell (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1457 Morrell (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on the inactive file. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Monning. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 18. Page 3923.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Morrell. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3924.) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 4. Page 3608.) (April 20). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. (For vote only) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | March 30 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 4. Page 3333.) Reconsideration granted. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 46014 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 53330 | New Code | See Bill Text |