CA SB1456 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 45600) to Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to school employment.
Title
School employment: Sexual Abuse-Free Education (SAFE) Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Morrell [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Asm. Steven Choi [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4622.) (April 11). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 45600 | New Code | See Bill Text |