CA SB1453 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 450, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 450, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2530.2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Speech language pathologists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1453 Ochoa Bogh Senate Third Reading By Holden (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1453 Ochoa Bogh Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1453 Ochoa Bogh (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1453 Ochoa Bogh Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1453 Ochoa Bogh (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 450, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5329.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3826.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3413.) (April 18). |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2530.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |