CA SB1452 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14635 to the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
War on Terror Memorial Committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Sen. Richard Roth [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1452 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5014.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4786.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14635 | New Code | See Bill Text |