CA SB1451 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's item veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 26031.1 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licenses: sale to underaged persons: penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1451 Fuller Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1451 Fuller Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1451 Fuller (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-10 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's item veto pending.
2018-09-10 Vetoed by the Governor.
2018-08-30SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-24SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5694.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-23SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6517.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2018-07-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4224.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-09SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-18SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4697.) (April 16).
2018-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-03SenateApril 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26031.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback