CA SB1448 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 570, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 1007, 2228.1, 2228.5, 2459.4, 3663.5, and 4962 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healing arts licensees: probation status: disclosure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1448 Hill Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 69 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1448 Hill et al. Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1448 Hill (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-19 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 570, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-19 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 6176.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 4386.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4311.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4783.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code1007New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code2228.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code2228.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code2459.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code3663.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4962New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code11600Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback