CA SB1448 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 570, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 570, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 1007, 2228.1, 2228.5, 2459.4, 3663.5, and 4962 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Healing arts licensees: probation status: disclosure.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1448 Hill Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 69 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1448 Hill et al. Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1448 Hill (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1448 Hill et al. Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1448 Hill (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 570, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 6176.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 4386.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4311.) (May 25). |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4783.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1007 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2228.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2228.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2459.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3663.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4962 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |