CA SB1447 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 666, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 666, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4400 of, to amend and repeal Sections 4105.5 and 4119.1 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 4008 and 4186 of, to add Section 4017.3 to, and to add Article 25 (commencing with Section 4427) to Chapter 9 of Division 2 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 1261.6 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Pharmacy: automated drug delivery systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1447 Hernandez et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1447 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1447 Hernandez et al (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1447 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1447 Hernandez et al (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 666, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 6129.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6975.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 4355.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4311.) (May 25). |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4783.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | April 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4017.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4068 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4105.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4119.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4186 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1261.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |