CA SB1443 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Article 5 (commencing with Section 49350) of Chapter 8 of Part 27 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to school safety, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School safety: the County of Riverside school metal detector pilot program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16SenateAugust 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-08-14SenateSet for hearing August 16.
2018-08-13SenateAugust 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 5202.) (August 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-06-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code49350Repealed CodeCitation Text
Labor Code2699Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback