CA SB1442 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 569, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 4113.5 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community pharmacies: staffing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1442 Wiener Senate Third Reading By CUNNINGHAM (Y: 70 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1442 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1442 Wiener et al (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-19 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 569, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-19 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6169.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 15).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (June 19).
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-10SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 5007.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-03SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-24SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 4697.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code4113.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback