CA SB1442 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 870, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 870, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 261 of the Education Code, and to amend Sections 11135, 11136, 11137, 11139, 12930, and 12935 of, to add Section 12957 to, to add Chapter 18 (commencing with Section 7400) and Chapter 18.1 (commencing with Section 7405) to Division 7 of Title 1 of, and to repeal Sections 11138, 11139.3, 11139.5, 11139.6, and 11139.7 of, the Government Code, relating to discrimination.
Title
Discrimination: regulations and enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB1442 Liu (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1442 Liu Senate Third Reading By RIDLEY-THOMAS (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1442 Liu (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1442 Liu Senate Third Reading By RIDLEY-THOMAS (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1442 Liu (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 870, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5431.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5904.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Waldron. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-08-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | June 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3956.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3611.) (April 19). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3494.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 261 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11136 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11137 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11138 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11139 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11139.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11139.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11139.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11139.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12930 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12935 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12957 | New Code | See Bill Text |