CA SB1441 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 977 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to natural gas.
Title
Natural gas: methane emissions.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1441 Leno Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 29 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1441 Leno Senate Third Reading By TRANS. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1441 Leno (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1441 Leno Senate Third Reading By TRANS. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1441 Leno (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | Died on unfinished business, reconsideration pending. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 29. Noes 33. Page 6379.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Mullin. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5971.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (August 10). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 4099.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4011.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3644.) (April 20). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3393.) (April 5). |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38572 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39731.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 747.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 977 | Amended Code | Citation Text |