CA SB1440 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 10 (commencing with Section 650) to Chapter 3 of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy: biomethane: biomethane procurement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1440 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1440 Hueso Senate Third Reading By GRAYSON (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1440 Hueso et al (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 25).
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-06-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 4417.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4310.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4719.) (April 18).
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 4719.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18 in EQ. pending receipt.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and EQ.
2018-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code25420Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code39730.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code40106Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code2814New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code2898Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code650New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code748.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback