CA SB1440 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 739, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 739, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 10 (commencing with Section 650) to Chapter 3 of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: biomethane: biomethane procurement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1440 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1440 Hueso Senate Third Reading By GRAYSON (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1440 Hueso et al (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1440 Hueso Senate Third Reading By GRAYSON (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1440 Hueso et al (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 739, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 6124.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 17. Page 6813.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 25). |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 4417.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4310.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4719.) (April 18). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 4719.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18 in EQ. pending receipt. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and EQ. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25420 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39730.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 40106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2814 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2898 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 650 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 748.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |